Answers

2016-02-16T20:45:38+05:30
Take the units digit of all the no.
say, 4,8,7 and  3
4*8=32 7*3=21
=21*32 
672
 the units digit in this number is 2 
therefore the units digit in the product of 
274*318 * 577 * 313

is = 2

CHECK= 
274*318 * 577 * 313= 15 736 126 332
0