Answers

2015-09-25T14:35:51+05:30
45 * 68 = 3060 45 * 86 = 3870 54 * 68 = 3672 54 * 86 = 4644 46 * 85 = 3910 48 * 65 = 3120 56 * 84 = 4704 4 * 856 = 3424 4 * 865 = 3460 5 * 648 = 3240 5 * 684 = 3420 5 * 846 = 4230 5 * 864 = 4320 6 * 548 = 3288 6 * 584 = 3504 8 * 456 = 3648 8 * 465 = 3720 8 * 546 = 4368 8 * 564 = 4512
0