Answers

2015-11-13T19:45:51+05:30
67*(6 + 7 )= 67*13 = 871
871*(8 + 7 + 1 )= 871* 16 = 13936 
13936*(1+3+9+3+6) = 13963 * 22=306592
306592*(3 + 0 + 6+5 +9+2)= 306592*25 = 7664800.
1 5 1
2015-11-13T19:51:47+05:30
67× (6+7) =871 ,
871×(8+7+1)=13936,
13936×(1+3+9+3+6) = 13936×22= 306592,,,
306592×(3+0+6+5+9+2) = 306592×25 = 7664800..

sooo next term is 7664800..
0