Answers

2014-12-19T07:06:36+05:30
22*22=16
33*33=36
44*44=64
1 4 1
The Brainliest Answer!
2014-12-19T13:06:24+05:30
22*22=16=(2+2)*(2+2)
33*33=36= (3+3)*(3+3)
44*44=(4+4)*(4+4)=64
2 4 2